AL SB412 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Assigned Act No. 2017-462.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Clayton, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales under certain conditions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clayton, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales under certain conditions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 63 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateAssigned Act No. 2017-462.
2017-05-19SenateEnrolled
2017-05-19HouseSignature Requested
2017-05-19SenatePassed Second House
2017-05-19HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 995
2017-05-19HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-05-16HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-05-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2017-05-11SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1016
2017-05-11SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-09SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-05-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback