AL SB411 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Education, public K-12, buses, local boards of education authorized to sell advertising space on buses, prohibit certain types of advertising

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education, public K-12, buses, local boards of education authorized to sell advertising space on buses, prohibit certain types of advertising

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28HousePending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Education Policy
2019-05-28HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-23HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
2019-05-23SenateEngrossed
2019-05-23SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1090
2019-05-23SenateReed motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1089
2019-05-23SenateReed Amendment Offered
2019-05-23SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-21SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-15SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback