AL SB41 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Judiciary first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Judiciary first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sexual assault, provide for victim notification, provide for certain rights to victims, Sexual Assault Task Force, created, Sexual Assault Survivors Bill of Rights
Title
Sexual assault, provide for victim notification, provide for certain rights to victims, Sexual Assault Task Force, created, Sexual Assault Survivors Bill of Rights
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Judiciary first Amendment Offered |
2019-04-18 | House | Judiciary second Amendment Offered |
2019-04-18 | House | Pending third reading on day 12 Favorable from Judiciary with 2 amendments |
2019-04-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2019-03-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 40 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 39 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |