AL SB406 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-473.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles, oversized vehicle permits, annual commercial wrecker emergency tow permit, provided, Sec. 32-9-29 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles, oversized vehicle permits, annual commercial wrecker emergency tow permit, provided, Sec. 32-9-29 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateAssigned Act No. 2019-473.
2019-05-30HouseSignature Requested
2019-05-30SenateEnrolled
2019-05-30HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2019-05-30SenateMarsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1364
2019-05-30SenateConcurrence Requested
2019-05-30HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1177
2019-05-30HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1176
2019-05-30HouseTransportation, Utilities and Infrastructure Amendment Offered
2019-05-30HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-05-23HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2019-05-21HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
2019-05-21SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 923
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-16SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB406&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB406-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201694-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=621069&VOTE=923&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626344&VOTE=1176&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626345&VOTE=1177&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626535&VOTE=1364&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback