AL SB403 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Assigned Act No. 2021-543.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Assigned Act No. 2021-543.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cullman Co., lodgings tax decreased upon retirement of certain debt, Cullman County Tourism Bureau estab., Secs. 45-22-242, 45-22-242.11 am'd.
Title
Cullman Co., lodgings tax decreased upon retirement of certain debt, Cullman County Tourism Bureau estab., Secs. 45-22-242, 45-22-242.11 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1166 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 68 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2021-05-17 - House - HBIR: Harbison motion to Adopt Roll Call 1165 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 50 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1280 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - SBIR: Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 1279 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - HBIR: Harbison motion to Adopt Roll Call 1165 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 50 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1280 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - SBIR: Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 1279 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-543. |
2021-05-17 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-05-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1166 |
2021-05-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-05-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1280 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
Same As/Similar To
HB647 (Same As) 2021-04-29 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 22 | 242 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 22 | 242.11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |