AL SB403 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Assigned Act No. 2017-347.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Senate, districts redrawn, Sec. 29-1-2.3 repealed; Sec. 29-1-2.3 added

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate, districts redrawn, Sec. 29-1-2.3 repealed; Sec. 29-1-2.3 added

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 71 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question (Y: 50 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 48) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateAssigned Act No. 2017-347.
2017-05-19SenateEnrolled
2017-05-19HouseSignature Requested
2017-05-18SenatePassed Second House
2017-05-18HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 984
2017-05-18HouseKnight Dissent Filed
2017-05-18HouseLedbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 983
2017-05-18HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-05-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-05-04HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
2017-05-04SenateEngrossed
2017-05-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 915
2017-05-04SenateRules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 913
2017-05-04SenateSmitherman motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 912
2017-05-04SenateSmitherman first Substitute Offered
2017-05-04SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 911
2017-05-04SenateTourism and Marketing first Substitute Offered
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2017-04-27SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism and Marketing

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB403&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB403-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/186192-4.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/186326-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=574412&VOTE=911&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=574520&VOTE=912&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=574521&VOTE=913&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=574637&VOTE=915&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578485&VOTE=983&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578537&VOTE=984&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback