AL SB403 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Labor relations, employer, employee rights, certain practices prohibited by local governments relating to leave and access to background information and to designate state for federal labor law disputes
Title
Labor relations, employer, employee rights, certain practices prohibited by local governments relating to leave and access to background information and to designate state for federal labor law disputes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Motion to Carry Over as Unfinished Business adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |