AL SB402 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Assigned Act No. 2019-540.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Barbour Co., law enforcement, authorized to take an individual with mental illness into protective custody under certain conditions, protection from civil and criminal liabilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Barbour Co., law enforcement, authorized to take an individual with mental illness into protective custody under certain conditions, protection from civil and criminal liabilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 76 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateAssigned Act No. 2019-540.
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled
2019-05-31HouseSignature Requested
2019-05-31SenatePassed Second House
2019-05-31HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1251
2019-05-31HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-05-30HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-29HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2019-05-29SenateEngrossed
2019-05-29SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1285
2019-05-29SenateSingleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1284
2019-05-29SenateBeasley Amendment Offered
2019-05-29SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-28SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback