AL SB400 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Chiropractic Examiners, St. Bd. of, licensed chiropractors, continuing education requirement, board to provide by rule, Sec. 34-24-165 amd.
Title
Chiropractic Examiners, St. Bd. of, licensed chiropractors, continuing education requirement, board to provide by rule, Sec. 34-24-165 amd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |