AL SB400 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Assigned Act No. 2014-433.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Assigned Act No. 2014-433.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Counties, co. commission, adoption of taxes, effective until rates change, notification of certain taxes, Sec. 40-7-42 am'd.
Title
Counties, co. commission, adoption of taxes, effective until rates change, notification of certain taxes, Sec. 40-7-42 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bussman [R] | Sen. Greg Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-433. |
2014-04-03 | House | Signature Requested |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2014-04-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1144 |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 936 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |