AL SB40 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Assigned Act No. 2016-42.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Assigned Act No. 2016-42.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Behavior Analyst Licensing Board, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2017.
Title
Behavior Analyst Licensing Board, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-42. |
2016-02-25 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-02-24 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 113 |
2016-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 88 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |