AL SB40 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Assigned Act No. 2014-375.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Engineers and Land Surveyors, State Board of Licensure for Professional, applicants required to pass board approved versus an 8-hour written exam, board authorized to contract with independent testing agency, simple majority of board a quorum, Secs. 34-11-1, 34-11-4, 34-11-6, 34-11-34 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Engineers and Land Surveyors, State Board of Licensure for Professional, applicants required to pass board approved versus an 8-hour written exam, board authorized to contract with independent testing agency, simple majority of board a quorum, Secs. 34-11-1, 34-11-4, 34-11-6, 34-11-34 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-01HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-375.
2014-04-01HouseSignature Requested
2014-04-01SenateEnrolled
2014-04-01SenatePassed Second House
2014-04-01HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1002
2014-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-02-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-02-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
2014-02-11SenateEngrossed
2014-02-06SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 288
2014-02-06SenateMarsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 287
2014-02-06SenateMarsh Amendment Offered
2014-02-06SenateAllen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 286
2014-02-06SenateGovernmental Affairs Amendment Offered
2014-02-06SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-01-21SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2014-01-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB40
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB40-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB40-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB40-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=483655&VOTE=286&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=483659&VOTE=287&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=483660&VOTE=288&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=498299&VOTE=1002&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback