AL SB4 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-473.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles, overtaking and passing bicycles, must maintain safe distance of at least three feet from bicycle, definition of safe distance, Sec. 32-5A-82 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles, overtaking and passing bicycles, must maintain safe distance of at least three feet from bicycle, definition of safe distance, Sec. 32-5A-82 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-04 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-473.
2015-06-04HouseSignature Requested
2015-06-04SenateEnrolled
2015-06-04HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2015-06-04SenateMarsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1524
2015-06-04SenateConcurrence Requested
2015-06-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1335
2015-06-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1334
2015-06-04HousePublic Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered
2015-06-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-06-02HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-03-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2015-03-18SenateEngrossed
2015-03-17SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 131
2015-03-17SenateHoltzclaw motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 130
2015-03-17SenateHoltzclaw Amendment No. 2 Offered.
2015-03-17SenateHoltzclaw motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2015-03-17SenateFurther consideration of Holtzclaw Amendment.
2015-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-03-12SenateAllen motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2015-03-12SenateHoltzclaw Amendment Offered
2015-03-12SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2015-03-05SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-03-03SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation & Energy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB4
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB4-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB4-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB4-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=505082&VOTE=130&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=505085&VOTE=131&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=526764&VOTE=1334&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=526766&VOTE=1335&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=526929&VOTE=1524&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback