AL SB398 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Assigned Act No. 2014-432.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Youthful offenders, records and photographs of, access to by district attorneys and Attorney General, Secs. 12-15-133. 15-19-7 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youthful offenders, records and photographs of, access to by district attorneys and Attorney General, Secs. 12-15-133. 15-19-7 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Dial Substitute as amended (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-432.
2014-04-03HouseSignature Requested
2014-04-03SenateEnrolled
2014-04-03SenatePassed Second House
2014-04-03HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1146
2014-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-04-02HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-04-01HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2014-04-01SenateEngrossed
2014-03-20SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1011
2014-03-20SenateDial Substitute as amended adopted Roll Call 1010.
2014-03-20SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1009
2014-03-20SenateDial Amendment to Dial Substitute Offered.
2014-03-20SenateDial first Substitute Offered
2014-03-20SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-03-05SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-02-20SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB398
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB398-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB398-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB398-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=497431&VOTE=1009&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=497435&VOTE=1010&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=497436&VOTE=1011&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=501162&VOTE=1146&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback