AL SB397 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Assigned Act No. 2021-517.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Assigned Act No. 2021-517.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages, winery in dry county, Alcoholic Beverage Board authorized to issue manufacturer license, distribution only to distributor or out-of-state, Sec. 28-7-10.1 add; Sec. 28-3A-3 am'd.
Title
Alcoholic beverages, winery in dry county, Alcoholic Beverage Board authorized to issue manufacturer license, distribution only to distributor or out-of-state, Sec. 28-7-10.1 add; Sec. 28-3A-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Jones [R] | Sen. Will Barfoot [R] | Sen. William Beasley [D] | Sen. Garlan Gudger [R] |
Sen. Steve Livingston [R] | Sen. Clay Scofield [R] | Sen. Bobby Singleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1216 (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1171 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Jones motion to Adopt Roll Call 1170 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - SBIR: Jones motion to Adopt Roll Call 1169 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1171 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Jones motion to Adopt Roll Call 1170 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - SBIR: Jones motion to Adopt Roll Call 1169 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-517. |
2021-05-17 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-05-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1216 |
2021-05-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-05-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-04-29 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1171 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Jones motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1170 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
Same As/Similar To
SB396 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 3A | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28 | 7 | 10.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |