AL SB397 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Assigned Act No. 2019-345.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Board of Education, State, renamed the Alabama Commission on Elementary and Secondary Education, members appointed by Governor, State Superintendent of Education renamed as the Secretary of Elementary and Secondary Education, secretary appointed by commission, Governor to appoint team to advise commission, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board of Education, State, renamed the Alabama Commission on Elementary and Secondary Education, members appointed by Governor, State Superintendent of Education renamed as the Secretary of Elementary and Secondary Education, secretary appointed by commission, Governor to appoint team to advise commission, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateAssigned Act No. 2019-345.
2019-05-31HouseSignature Requested
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled
2019-05-31SenatePassed Second House
2019-05-31HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1255
2019-05-31HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-05-22HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-21HouseRereferred from W&ME to EP
2019-05-16HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2019-05-16SenateEngrossed
2019-05-16SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 896
2019-05-16SenateMarsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 895
2019-05-16SenateSingleton Amendment Offered
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-15SenateMarsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-15SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2019-05-14SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB397&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB397-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB397-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB397-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201306-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=620542&VOTE=895&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=620543&VOTE=896&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=627534&VOTE=1255&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback