AL SB397 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Private schools, use of terms profit and nonprofit in definition clarified, baseline exemption date changed, Secs. 16-46-1, 16-46-3 am'd.
Title
Private schools, use of terms profit and nonprofit in definition clarified, baseline exemption date changed, Secs. 16-46-1, 16-46-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Dixon [R] | Sen. Vivian Figures [D] | Sen. Rusty Glover [R] | Sen. Wendell Mitchell [D] |
Sen. Trip Pittman [R] | Sen. Hank Sanders [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Education Policy | |
2010-03-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-25 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy | |
2010-02-25 | Engrossed | |
2010-02-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 364 | |
2010-02-23 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 363 | |
2010-02-23 | Figures Amendment Offered | |
2010-02-23 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 362 | |
2010-02-23 | Education Amendment Offered | |
2010-02-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-17 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2010-02-09 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education |