AL SB396 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Assigned Act No. 2018-530.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Assigned Act No. 2018-530.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Macon Co., tobacco tax, distrib. of portion for recreational purpose, Sec. 45-44-246 am'd.
Title
Macon Co., tobacco tax, distrib. of portion for recreational purpose, Sec. 45-44-246 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 58 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-530. |
2018-03-29 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-29 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1102 |
2018-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-28 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-22 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1146 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |