AL SB396 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Conference Committee on SB396 2012RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Conference Committee on SB396 2012RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2012, from various funds to various state agencies, departments, boards, etc., certain appropriations to Corrections Department reduced, certain unexpended line-item appropriations deleted
Title
Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2012, from various funds to various state agencies, departments, boards, etc., certain appropriations to Corrections Department reduced, certain unexpended line-item appropriations deleted
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-18 - House - Barton motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-18 - Senate - Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-18 - Senate - Bedford motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 10 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-05-18 - Senate - Petition to cease debate (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - Barton motion to Accede (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - Barton motion to Table (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - Barton motion to Table (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Petition to cease debate (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-18 - Senate - Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-18 - Senate - Bedford motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 10 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-05-18 - Senate - Petition to cease debate (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - Barton motion to Accede (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - Barton motion to Table (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - Barton motion to Table (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Petition to cease debate (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Conference Committee on SB396 2012RS first Substitute Offered | |
2012-05-16 | Delivered to Governor at 11:30 p.m. on May 16, 2012 | |
2012-05-16 | Assigned Act No. 2012-564. | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Concurred in Conference Report | |
2012-05-16 | Barton motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1590 | |
2012-05-16 | Conference Report Concurrence Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1417 | |
2012-05-16 | Bedford motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee lost Roll Call 1416 | |
2012-05-16 | Petition to cease debate adopted Roll Call 1415 | |
2012-05-16 | Conference Report | |
2012-05-01 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-05-01 | Barton motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1073 House appoints Harper, Barton and Colston | |
2012-05-01 | Conference Committee Requested | |
2012-04-26 | Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 836 Senate appoints Williams, Orr and Smith. | |
2012-04-26 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-04-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1018 | |
2012-04-26 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1017 | |
2012-04-26 | Barton Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-26 | Barton motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1016 | |
2012-04-26 | W&MGF 2nd Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-26 | Barton motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1015 | |
2012-04-26 | W&MGF 1st Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund | |
2012-04-05 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 452 | |
2012-04-03 | Petition to cease debate adopted Roll Call 450 | |
2012-04-03 | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 451 | |
2012-04-03 | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-03-15 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |