AL SB395 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Education Policy first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Education Policy first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School transportation, transporting students to and from extracurricular activities other than by bus, authorized, Sec. 16-27-1 am'd.
Title
School transportation, transporting students to and from extracurricular activities other than by bus, authorized, Sec. 16-27-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Education Policy first Amendment Offered |
2015-06-03 | House | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Education Policy with 1 amendment |
2015-06-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-05-26 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1209 |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs |