AL SB395 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 4:50 p.m. on June 2, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 4:50 p.m. on June 2, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Property, income tax deduction the lesser of 50 percent of costs or $3,000 for retrofit improvements to homes to help withstand hurricane and windstorm damages, rate filings and related actuarial information for homeowners insurance coverage to be public information available on Internet (2011-21133)
Title
Property, income tax deduction the lesser of 50 percent of costs or $3,000 for retrofit improvements to homes to help withstand hurricane and windstorm damages, rate filings and related actuarial information for homeowners insurance coverage to be public information available on Internet (2011-21133)
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Brooks [R] | Sen. Trip Pittman [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Brooks motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 4:50 p.m. on June 2, 2011 | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-644. | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2011-06-02 | Brooks motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 973 | |
2011-06-02 | Concurrence Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1087 | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1086 | |
2011-06-02 | McMillan first Substitute Offered | |
2011-06-02 | Insurance Amendment Offered | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance | |
2011-05-25 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-25 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 719 | |
2011-05-25 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 718 | |
2011-05-25 | Allen first Substitute Offered | |
2011-05-25 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Re-referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance | |
2011-04-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |