AL SB391 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Vessels, derelict, leaving in waters of this state in counties bordering on Gulf of Mexico, prohibited under certain conditions, penalties, procedures for exercising authority over derelict vessels and selling at public auction (2011-20640)
Title
Vessels, derelict, leaving in waters of this state in counties bordering on Gulf of Mexico, prohibited under certain conditions, penalties, procedures for exercising authority over derelict vessels and selling at public auction (2011-20640)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-31 | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure | |
2011-05-25 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-25 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 731 | |
2011-05-25 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 730 | |
2011-05-25 | Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities first Substitute Offered | |
2011-05-25 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2011-04-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities |