AL SB390 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Commerce and Small Business
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Commerce and Small Business
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Community development, alcoholic beverages in annexed territory, Sec. 35-8B-1 am'd.
Title
Community development, alcoholic beverages in annexed territory, Sec. 35-8B-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Keahey motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Keahey motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Commerce and Small Business |
2013-05-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Engrossed |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 907 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Keahey motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 906 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |