AL SB39 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Dam safety, elective procedures provided for state-owned dams

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dam safety, elective procedures provided for state-owned dams

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-20 - House - Passed Second House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Third Reading Second House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Chambliss amendment W4WC995-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-29SenateEnacted
2024-02-29SenateEnacted
2024-02-22HouseSignature Requested
2024-02-22SenateEnrolled
2024-02-22SenateDelivered to Governor
2024-02-21SenateReady to Enroll
2024-02-20HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 21
2024-02-20HouseThird Reading in Second House
2024-02-14HouseRead for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
2024-02-14HouseReported Out of Committee Second House
2024-02-13HousePending House Ports, Waterways & Intermodal Transit
2024-02-13HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ports, Waterways & Intermodal Transit
2024-02-13SenateEngrossed
2024-02-07Senate V4H4VLP-1
2024-02-07Senate V4H4VLP-1
2024-02-08HousePending House Ports, Waterways & Intermodal Transit
2024-02-08HouseFirst Reading Second House
2024-02-08SenateEngrossed
2024-02-08SenateChambliss motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 11 W4WC995-1
2024-02-08SenateChambliss Amendment Offered W4WC995-1
2024-02-08SenateChambliss motion to Table - Adopted Voice Vote V4H4VLP-1
2024-02-08SenateSGA Amendment Offered V4H4VLP-1
2024-02-08SenateThird Reading in House of Origin
2024-02-07SenateRead for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
2024-02-07SenateReported Out of Committee House of Origin
2024-02-06SenatePending Senate State Governmental Affairs
2024-02-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on State Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/SB39-int.pdf
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/SB39-eng.pdf
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/SB39-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/V4H4VLP-1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/W4WC995-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/FiscalNotes/FN-GXAW66C-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/FiscalNotes/FN-GXAW66C-2.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/FiscalNotes/FN-GXAW66C-3.pdf
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc10
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc11
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc20
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc21

Bill Comments

feedback