AL SB39 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to judges; to provide for additional circuit judgeships and additional district judgeships; to provide for the authority of the judges and for the compensation and benefits of the judges; to prohibit the Judicial Resources Allocation Commission from reallocating any vacant judgeships until January 1, 2027; and to require the Administrative Office of Courts to provide certain statistical data annually.
Title
Relating to judges; to provide for additional circuit judgeships and additional district judgeships; to provide for the authority of the judges and for the compensation and benefits of the judges; to prohibit the Judicial Resources Allocation Commission from reallocating any vacant judgeships until January 1, 2027; and to require the Administrative Office of Courts to provide certain statistical data annually.
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Givhan [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Adopt VTRGPL-1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Adopt VTRGPL-1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | Senate | Enacted |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-05-23 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2023-05-23 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-23 | House | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-17 | House | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-17 | House | Reported Favorably from House Judiciary |
2023-05-11 | House | Referred to Committee to House Judiciary |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Adopt VTRGPL-1 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Table GPJU6C-1 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Judiciary |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Judiciary |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Judiciary GPJU6C-1 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Read First Time in House of Origin |