AL SB39 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Assigned Act No. 2022-411.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Assigned Act No. 2022-411.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jefferson Co., municipality or municipal utility system, boards, mayor, service as superintendent of utility, salary increased, authorize under Sec. 11-43-80, Code of Alabama 1975, Act 258, 1975 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Title
Jefferson Co., municipality or municipal utility system, boards, mayor, service as superintendent of utility, salary increased, authorize under Sec. 11-43-80, Code of Alabama 1975, Act 258, 1975 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1113 (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1017 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 65 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2022-04-07 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 1016 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 64 Abs: 34) [FAIL]
2022-04-07 - House - Coleman motion to Table Roll Call 1015 (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 58 Abs: 39) [FAIL]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 409 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 408 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1017 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 65 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2022-04-07 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 1016 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 64 Abs: 34) [FAIL]
2022-04-07 - House - Coleman motion to Table Roll Call 1015 (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 58 Abs: 39) [FAIL]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 409 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 408 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-411. |
2022-04-07 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-04-07 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1113 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2022-04-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1017 |
2022-04-07 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1016 |
2022-04-07 | House | Coleman motion to Table lost Roll Call 1015 |
2022-04-07 | House | Alexander Amendment Offered |
2022-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-04-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 409 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Jefferson County Legislation |