AL SB39 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Assigned Act No. 2021-272.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Assigned Act No. 2021-272.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer Protection, Alabama State of Emergency Consumer Protection Act, enhanced criminal penalties provided under certain conditions, Sec. 13A-9-111.1 added; Sec. 13A-9-114, 34-14A-14, 34-31-32, 34-36-16, 34-37-17 am'd.
Title
Consumer Protection, Alabama State of Emergency Consumer Protection Act, enhanced criminal penalties provided under certain conditions, Sec. 13A-9-111.1 added; Sec. 13A-9-114, 34-14A-14, 34-31-32, 34-36-16, 34-37-17 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Price [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 802 (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - HBIR: Simpson motion to Adopt Roll Call 801 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 120 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 119 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - SBIR: Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 118 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - HBIR: Simpson motion to Adopt Roll Call 801 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 120 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 119 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - SBIR: Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 118 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-272. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor on April 15, 2021 at 10:35 a.m. on April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-15 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-04-13 | House | Simpson intended to vote "Yea" |
2021-04-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 802 |
2021-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 120 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Price motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 119 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB27 (Same As) 2021-05-17 - Further Consideration
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13A | 9 | 111.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
13A | 9 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 14A | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 31 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 36 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 37 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |