AL SB39 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Assigned Act No. 2018-552.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Controlled substances, Fentanyl and Fentanyl analogues included in schedule I, criminal penalties for trafficking, Secs. 13A-12-211, 13A-12-231, 20-2-23 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances, Fentanyl and Fentanyl analogues included in schedule I, criminal penalties for trafficking, Secs. 13A-12-211, 13A-12-231, 20-2-23 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - House - Weaver motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Ward motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - Weaver motion to Accede (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Ward motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Weaver motion to Table (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Weaver motion to Table (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-552.
2018-03-28SenateConference Committee on SB39 2018RS first Substitute Offered
2018-03-28HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-28SenateEnrolled
2018-03-28SenateConcurred in Conference Report
2018-03-28HouseWeaver motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1098
2018-03-28HouseConference Report Concurrence Requested
2018-03-28SenateWard motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1238
2018-03-28SenateConference Report
2018-03-27SenateConference Committee Appointed
2018-03-27HouseWeaver motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1065 House appoints Weaver, Beech and Fridy
2018-03-27SenateConcurrence Requested
2018-03-27SenateWard motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1167 P&PO appoints Ward, Singleton and McClendon
2018-03-27HouseConference Committee Requested
2018-03-22HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1045
2018-03-22HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1044
2018-03-22HouseHill Amendment Offered
2018-03-22HouseWeaver motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1043
2018-03-22HouseEngland Amendment Offered
2018-03-22HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1042
2018-03-22HouseWeaver first Substitute Offered
2018-03-22HouseWeaver motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1041
2018-03-22HouseHealth first Substitute Offered
2018-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-01HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2018-01-30HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
2018-01-30SenateEngrossed
2018-01-30SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 177
2018-01-30SenateWard motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 176
2018-01-30SenateWard Amendment Offered
2018-01-30SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB39&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB39-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB39-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB39-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/190776-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/191972-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193489-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193898-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193776-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/194053-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=584220&VOTE=176&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=584221&VOTE=177&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600918&VOTE=1041&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600920&VOTE=1042&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600922&VOTE=1043&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600924&VOTE=1044&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600925&VOTE=1045&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=601336&VOTE=1167&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=601568&VOTE=1065&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=602307&VOTE=1238&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=602411&VOTE=1098&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback