AL SB39 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Conservation and Natural Resources Department, regulation of public exhibition of wildlife, additional fee authorized, exemptions revised, Secs. 9-11-324, 9-11-328 am'd.
Title
Conservation and Natural Resources Department, regulation of public exhibition of wildlife, additional fee authorized, exemptions revised, Secs. 9-11-324, 9-11-328 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 804 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Ward Amendment Offered |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |