AL SB385 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-278.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Banks and Banking, ownership and acquisition of control, stock, approval of superintendent if certain voting securities acquired, Sec. 5-5A-44 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Banks and Banking, ownership and acquisition of control, stock, approval of superintendent if certain voting securities acquired, Sec. 5-5A-44 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Blackwell motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Blackwell motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Blackwell motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-278.
2016-05-04HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2016-05-04HouseSignature Requested
2016-05-04SenateEnrolled
2016-05-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 842
2016-05-04SenateBlackwell motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 985
2016-05-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 841
2016-05-04SenateConcurrence Requested
2016-05-04HouseHammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 840
2016-05-04HouseHill (M) Amendment Offered
2016-05-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-04-27HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-20HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services
2016-04-20SenateEngrossed
2016-04-19SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 689
2016-04-19SenateBlackwell motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 688
2016-04-19SenateBlackwell Amendment Offered
2016-04-19SenateBlackwell motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 687
2016-04-19SenateBanking and Insurance Amendment Offered
2016-04-19SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-13SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2016-04-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB385
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016RS/PrintFiles/SB385-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=546948&VOTE=687&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=546950&VOTE=688&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=546952&VOTE=689&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551965&VOTE=840&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551968&VOTE=841&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552168&VOTE=985&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551969&VOTE=842&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback