AL SB385 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Forwarded to Governor on March 23, 2010 at 4:00 p.m. on March 23, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Forwarded to Governor on March 23, 2010 at 4:00 p.m. on March 23, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dental Examiners of Alabama, Board of, fees, quorum, Secs. 34-9-10, 34-9-16, 34-9-41, 34-9-42 am'd.
Title
Dental Examiners of Alabama, Board of, fees, quorum, Secs. 34-9-10, 34-9-16, 34-9-41, 34-9-42 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Forwarded to Governor on March 23, 2010 at 4:00 p.m. on March 23, 2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Signature Requested | |
2010-03-23 | Assigned Act No. 2010-262. | |
2010-03-23 | Enrolled | |
2010-03-23 | Passed Second House | |
2010-03-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 618 | |
2010-03-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-23 | SB385 substituted for HB522 | |
2010-02-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards and Commissions | |
2010-02-23 | Engrossed | |
2010-02-18 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 319 | |
2010-02-18 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 318 | |
2010-02-18 | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered | |
2010-02-18 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-16 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2010-02-09 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |