AL SB381 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Assigned Act No. 2019-266.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Assigned Act No. 2019-266.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limestone Co., TVA in-lieu-of-taxes payments, distrib. to volunteer fire depts, further provided for when volunteer fire dept is decertified, Sec. 45-42-163 am'd.
Title
Limestone Co., TVA in-lieu-of-taxes payments, distrib. to volunteer fire depts, further provided for when volunteer fire dept is decertified, Sec. 45-42-163 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Butler [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 77 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-266. |
2019-05-21 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 786 |
2019-05-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Limestone County Legislation |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 707 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |