AL SB38 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned Act No. 2018-384.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Judges, private, types of cases expanded, Secs. 12-11A-2, 12-11A-4 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judges, private, types of cases expanded, Secs. 12-11A-2, 12-11A-4 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-384.
2018-03-21SenateDelivered to Governor at 4:34 p.m. on March 21, 2018
2018-03-21SenateEnrolled
2018-03-21HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-21SenatePassed Second House
2018-03-21HouseGivan intended to vote "Yea"
2018-03-21HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 947
2018-03-21HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-01HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-13HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2018-02-13SenateEngrossed
2018-02-13SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 372
2018-02-13SenateWard motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 371
2018-02-13SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2018-02-13SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback