AL SB38 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Assigned Act No. 2014-245.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Schools, nonpublic, including private and church schools, State Department of Education prohibited from regulating or licensing, public colleges and universities prohibted from denying admittance to students based on attendance at nonpublic schools, department may not deny certification to a person because of employment by a nonpublic school, Secs. 16-1-11, 16-28-1, 16-28-7, 16-46-1 to 16-46-10, inclusive, am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools, nonpublic, including private and church schools, State Department of Education prohibited from regulating or licensing, public colleges and universities prohibted from denying admittance to students based on attendance at nonpublic schools, department may not deny certification to a person because of employment by a nonpublic school, Secs. 16-1-11, 16-28-1, 16-28-7, 16-46-1 to 16-46-10, inclusive, am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-19 - House - Hubbard (J) motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 62 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - Hubbard (J) motion to Accede (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Concur in House Amendment (Y: 2 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 66 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Ross motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-19SenateAssigned Act No. 2014-245.
2014-03-19SenateEnrolled
2014-03-19HouseSignature Requested
2014-03-19SenateConcurred in Conference Report
2014-03-19HouseHubbard (J) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 874
2014-03-19HouseConference Report Concurrence Requested
2014-03-19SenateBrewbaker motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 870
2014-03-19SenateConference Committee on SB38 2014RS first Substitute Offered
2014-03-19SenateConference Report
2014-03-18SenateConference Committee Appointed
2014-03-18HouseHubbard (J) motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 796 House appoints Hubbard (J), Henry and McClurkin
2014-03-18HouseConference Committee Requested
2014-03-13SenateMarsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 776 P&PO appoints P&PO appoints Brewbaker, Pittman & Ross
2014-03-13SenateSmitherman motion to Concur in House Amendment lost Roll Call 775
2014-03-13SenateRules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 774
2014-03-13SenateConcurrence Requested
2014-03-11HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 665
2014-03-11HouseMcClurkin intended to vote "Yea"
2014-03-11HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 664
2014-03-11HouseMcClurkin Amendment Offered
2014-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-02-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-01-30HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
2014-01-30SenateEngrossed
2014-01-28SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 186
2014-01-28SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-01-28SenateBrewbaker motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2014-01-28SenateRoss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 163
2014-01-28SenateRoss Amendment Offered
2014-01-28SenateBrewbaker motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 162
2014-01-28SenateEducation first Substitute Offered
2014-01-28SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2014-01-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2014-01-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB38
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB38-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB38-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB38-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=481111&VOTE=162&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=481113&VOTE=163&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=481209&VOTE=186&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=492683&VOTE=664&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=492684&VOTE=665&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=493888&VOTE=774&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=493889&VOTE=775&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=493890&VOTE=776&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=494295&VOTE=796&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=495528&VOTE=870&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=496057&VOTE=874&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback