AL SB379 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-400.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Behavior Analyst Licensing Board, revised to remove maximum fines, establish board within Mental Health, further provide for board members and qualifications for licensure, Secs. 34-5A-3, 34-5A-4, 34-5A-6, 34-5A-7 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Behavior Analyst Licensing Board, revised to remove maximum fines, establish board within Mental Health, further provide for board members and qualifications for licensure, Secs. 34-5A-3, 34-5A-4, 34-5A-6, 34-5A-7 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 70 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-400.
2016-05-04HouseSignature Requested
2016-05-04SenateEnrolled
2016-05-04SenatePassed Second House
2016-05-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 844
2016-05-04HouseHammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 843
2016-05-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-04-28HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-27HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
2016-04-27SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 863
2016-04-27SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-20SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback