AL SB378 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Technology and Research
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Technology and Research
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Space, Alabama Space Authority created, Alabama Department of Economic and Community Affairs, Alabama Development Office, Alabama Department of Transportation, Governors office, Legislature, promote space exploration
Title
Space, Alabama Space Authority created, Alabama Department of Economic and Community Affairs, Alabama Development Office, Alabama Department of Transportation, Governors office, Legislature, promote space exploration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - Senate - Motion to Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Technology and Research |
2013-05-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Technology and Research |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Engrossed |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended adopted Roll Call 664 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 663 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Dial Amendment No. 2 Offered. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Dial to Reconsider passage vote adopted Voice Vote . |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Dial to reconsider third reading adopted Voice Vote . |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 662 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 661 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Dial Amendment Offered |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 660 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Governmental Affairs No. 2 Amendment Offered. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 659 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |