AL SB377 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Forwarded to Governor at 6:11 p.m. on March 28, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Forwarded to Governor at 6:11 p.m. on March 28, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Colbert Co., gasoline tax, three cents per gallon, distrib. to co. and mun. for road and bridge construction
Title
Colbert Co., gasoline tax, three cents per gallon, distrib. to co. and mun. for road and bridge construction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 75 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor at 6:11 p.m. on March 28, 2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-28 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1074 |
2018-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-27 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-22 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1017 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |