AL SB377 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-21 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Marriage, license issuance function of judge of probate removed, contract , requirements, contract to be filed with judge of probate and forwarded to Office of Vital Statistics, fees for recording, Secs. 30-1-9, 30-1-10, 30-1-11 repealed; Secs. 12-19-90, 22-9A-17, 30-1-5, 30-1-12, 30-1-13, 30-1-14, 30-1-16, 30-6-11 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage, license issuance function of judge of probate removed, contract , requirements, contract to be filed with judge of probate and forwarded to Office of Vital Statistics, fees for recording, Secs. 30-1-9, 30-1-10, 30-1-11 repealed; Secs. 12-19-90, 22-9A-17, 30-1-5, 30-1-12, 30-1-13, 30-1-14, 30-1-16, 30-6-11 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-21HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2015-05-21SenateEngrossed
2015-05-19SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1055
2015-05-19SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-05-19SenateAlbritton motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2015-05-19SenateAlbritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1036
2015-05-19SenateJudiciary first Substitute Offered
2015-05-19SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2015-04-30SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2015-04-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback