AL SB374 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Assigned Act No. 2015-241.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Assigned Act No. 2015-241.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jefferson Co., municipalities, issuance of license plates, issuance fees and commissions, retention by municipality, retroactive effect, Act 2012-196, 2012 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Title
Jefferson Co., municipalities, issuance of license plates, issuance fees and commissions, retention by municipality, retroactive effect, Act 2012-196, 2012 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 53 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 53 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-241. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-05-21 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-05-21 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1073 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2015-05-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 927 |
2015-05-21 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 926 |
2015-05-21 | House | Carns first Substitute Offered |
2015-05-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-14 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 651 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Jefferson County |