AL SB372 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-399.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Controlled substances, children, exposure to by mother, immunity from criminal liability upon good faith belief that use was pursuant to lawful prescription; reporting of chemical endangerment not required under certain conditions, Sec. 26-15-3.3 added

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances, children, exposure to by mother, immunity from criminal liability upon good faith belief that use was pursuant to lawful prescription; reporting of chemical endangerment not required under certain conditions, Sec. 26-15-3.3 added

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 56 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-399.
2016-05-04SenateEnrolled
2016-05-04HouseSignature Requested
2016-05-04SenatePassed Second House
2016-05-03HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 828
2016-05-03HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-04-26HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-20HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
2016-04-19SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 685
2016-04-19SenateChambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 684
2016-04-19SenateHealth and Human Services Amendment Offered
2016-04-20SenateEngrossed
2016-04-19SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2016-03-22SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback