AL SB370 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Forwarded to Governor on May 9, 2012 at 11:23 a.m. on May 9, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Forwarded to Governor on May 9, 2012 at 11:23 a.m. on May 9, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Minors, veterans honorably discharged under the age of 19 may enter into contract for purchase of a motor vehicle, Sec. 26-1-1 am'd
Title
Minors, veterans honorably discharged under the age of 19 may enter into contract for purchase of a motor vehicle, Sec. 26-1-1 am'd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Forwarded to Governor on May 9, 2012 at 11:23 a.m. on May 9, 2012 | |
2012-05-09 | Assigned Act No. 2012-415. | |
2012-05-09 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-09 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-08 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1353 | |
2012-05-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-17 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 578 | |
2012-04-12 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-28 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |