AL SB369 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Assigned Act No. 2016-204.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Assigned Act No. 2016-204.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cleburne Co., coroner, expenses further provided for
Title
Cleburne Co., coroner, expenses further provided for
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 65 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-204. |
2016-04-21 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-04-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 708 |
2016-04-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 614 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |