AL SB369 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:23 p.m. on June 2, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:23 p.m. on June 2, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Forever Wild Land Trust, reauthorized for certain number of years, const. amend. (2011-20924)
Title
Forever Wild Land Trust, reauthorized for certain number of years, const. amend. (2011-20924)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 78 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:23 p.m. on June 2, 2011 | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-315. | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Chesteen, Merrill and Beckman intended to vote "Yea" | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 613 | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1061 | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 612 | |
2011-05-05 | Beason first Substitute Offered | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Brewbaker motion to Table adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism | |
2011-05-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Engrossed | |
2011-04-27 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-04-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |