AL SB368 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Assigned Act No. 2018-408.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Assigned Act No. 2018-408.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Anniston, council-manager, city council, transfer of appropriations, Act 404, 1953 Reg. Sess., am'd; Sec. 45-8A-23.176 am'd.
Title
Anniston, council-manager, city council, transfer of appropriations, Act 404, 1953 Reg. Sess., am'd; Sec. 45-8A-23.176 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 76 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 55 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 55 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-408. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 12:00 p.m. on March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-22 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 980 |
2018-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 901 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |