AL SB367 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Assigned Act No. 2019-338.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Assigned Act No. 2019-338.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Baldwin Co., lease tax, distrib of proceeds, Sec. 45-2-244.183 am'd.
Title
Baldwin Co., lease tax, distrib of proceeds, Sec. 45-2-244.183 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 79 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 78 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Elliott motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 79 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 78 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Elliott motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-338. |
2019-05-23 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1155 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 897 |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 896 |
2019-05-23 | House | Baldwin County Legislation first Substitute Offered |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2019-05-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 659 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Elliott motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 658 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Local Legislation first Substitute Offered |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |