AL SB367 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-01 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
Pending: House Constitution, Campaigns and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-01 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
Pending: House Constitution, Campaigns and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
County commissions, home rule, limited power to establish, personnel policies, community, transportation and emergency assistance programs, policies for operation of county offices and elections and polling places, const. amend.
Title
County commissions, home rule, limited power to establish, personnel policies, community, transportation and emergency assistance programs, policies for operation of county offices and elections and polling places, const. amend.
Sponsors
Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt Sanford Amendment (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt Sanford Amendment (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Engrossed |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1027 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Marsh motion to Adopt Sanford Amendment adopted Roll Call 1026 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Sanford Amendment Offered |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1023 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Singleton Amendment Offered |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1022 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Governmental Affairs first Substitute Offered |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |