AL SB367 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Delivered to Governor at 11:26 a.m. on May 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Delivered to Governor at 11:26 a.m. on May 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Paddlefish (spoonbill), Conservation and Natural Resources Department, commercial paddlefish dealer license, fees, reciprocity, penalties, Sec. 9-11-153 am'd
Title
Paddlefish (spoonbill), Conservation and Natural Resources Department, commercial paddlefish dealer license, fees, reciprocity, penalties, Sec. 9-11-153 am'd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Delivered to Governor at 11:26 a.m. on May 10, 2012 | |
2012-05-10 | Assigned Act No. 2012-471. | |
2012-05-10 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-10 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-09 | Fincher intended to vote "Yea" | |
2012-05-09 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1458 | |
2012-05-09 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-17 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 588 | |
2012-04-12 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |