AL SB366 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Judiciary first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Impeachment, Legislature auth. to issue subpoenas to compel testimony and production of documents, enforcement, penalties for non-compliance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Impeachment, Legislature auth. to issue subpoenas to compel testimony and production of documents, enforcement, penalties for non-compliance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09HouseJudiciary first Substitute Offered
2017-05-09HousePending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 substitute
2017-05-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2017-05-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2017-05-02SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 851
2017-05-02SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-04-13SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-04-11SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback