AL SB366 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-398.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Court costs, fines and restitution, attachment to certain benefits of the Teachers' Retirement System and the Employees' Retirement System, Secs. 16-25-23, 36-27-28 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court costs, fines and restitution, attachment to certain benefits of the Teachers' Retirement System and the Employees' Retirement System, Secs. 16-25-23, 36-27-28 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 62 N: 17 NV: 13 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-398.
2016-05-04SenateEnrolled
2016-05-04HouseSignature Requested
2016-05-04SenatePassed Second House
2016-05-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 904
2016-05-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-04-28HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-27HouseRereferred from Ways and Means Educaiton to Judiciary
2016-04-26HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2016-04-26SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 821
2016-04-26SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-03-17SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback