AL SB366 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Assigned Act No. 2015-319.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Assisted living administrators, licensure and regulation, replacement license fee, annual administrative fee, reapplication fee, disciplinary actions, Secs. 34-2A-2, 34-2A-8, 34-2A-11, 34-2A-12, 34-2A-13 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assisted living administrators, licensure and regulation, replacement license fee, annual administrative fee, reapplication fee, disciplinary actions, Secs. 34-2A-2, 34-2A-8, 34-2A-11, 34-2A-12, 34-2A-13 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-28 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-28SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-319.
2015-05-28SenateEnrolled
2015-05-28HouseSignature Requested
2015-05-28SenatePassed Second House
2015-05-28HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1179
2015-05-28HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-05-14HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-05-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
2015-05-05SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 760
2015-05-05SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-04-28SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-04-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback